Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 04:34:53 (UTC).

RICHARD A. BALL v. EAST END DELI, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 RICHARD A BALL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EAST END DELI, INC. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7-19

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AS COMMISSIONER OF AGRICULTURE AND MARKETS OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Richard A. Ball as Commissioner of Agriculture and Markets of the State of New York

Defendants

EAST END DELI, INC. d/b/a Duffy's Deli

D/B/A DUFFY'S DELI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERSAUD, NICOLE DEVI

Attorney at NYS DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE & MARKETS

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Letter From Attorney General

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Letter From Attorney General; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons With Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons With Notice; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Persaud, N. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EAST END DELI, INC. d/b/a Duffy's Deli

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EAST END DELI, INC. d/b/a Duffy's Deli; Filed By: Persaud, N. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Letter From Attorney General; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Copy of Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons With Notice; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Persaud, N. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EAST END DELI, INC. d/b/a Duffy's Deli; Filed By: Persaud, N. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Persaud, N.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less