Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:18:58 (UTC).

Richard A. Ball - v. - A&N Food Enterprises Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Richard A Ball filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A N Food Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NYS COMMISSIONER OF AGRICULTURE & MARKETS as Commissioner of Agriculture and Markets of the State of New York

Defendants

- D/b/a A&n food enterprises inc, A&N Food Enterprises Inc. d/b/a Compare Food Market

COMPARE FOOD MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD, FREDERICK B.

SWARTZ, LARRY ALLAN

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE & MARKETS

RODRIGUEZ, JAMES R.

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE INSURANCE FUND

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) entered by clerk

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Swartz, L.; Filed: 08/01/2018; Received: 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 06/14/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Letter from Attorney General; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons with Notice; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Arnold, F.; Filed: 02/13/2018; Received: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rodriguez, J. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rodriguez, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less