Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:39:03 (UTC).

REVOLVING MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2017-BRQ1, BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE v. JACQUELINE POGUE et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 REVOLVING MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2017-BRQ1, BY U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JACQUELINE POGUE. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Arlene P Bluth and Francis A Kahn Iii. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Arlene P Bluth

Francis A Kahn Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVOLVING MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST 2017-BRQ1, BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

Jacqueline Pogue A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE

John Doe (SAID NAME BEING FICTITIOUS TO REPRESENT UNKNOWN TENANTS/OCCUPANTS OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY AND ANY OTHER PARTY OR ENTITY OF ANY KIND, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE MORTGAGED PROPERTY)

BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LE PREMIER CONDOMINIUM

Not Yet Classified

STERN & EISENBERG, PC

united states of america

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASCINO, MARGARET JAFFE

Attorney at STERN & EISENBERG, P.C.

LAWRENCE, PETER ADEL

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

BILSKI, CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at BILSKI & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

HOLLAND, ROBERT T

Attorney at BELKIN BURDEN GOLDMAN, LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg

GURA, JOHN E.

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- S.D.N.Y.

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Signed AOS Notice of Conference to notify the borrower/attorney about court request and the new set ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Signed AOS Notice of Conference to notify the borrower/attorney about court request and the new set ... show more; Filed By: Lawrence, P.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Letter sent via Certified Mail to the borrower's attorneys office on 2/21/2020.

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Letter sent via Certified Mail to the borrower's attorneys office on 2/21/2020.; Filed By: Lawrence, P.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE A/K/A DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE A/K/A DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE - VACANT - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE - VACANT - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LE PREMIER CONDOMINIUM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LE PREMIER CONDOMINIUM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Bilski, C.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANC ... show more

AFFIDAVIT JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANC ... show more; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Signed AOS Notice of Conference to notify the borrower/attorney about court request and the new settlement conference date scheduled on 3/25/2020, at 2:15 PM.; Filed By: Lawrence, P.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Letter sent via Certified Mail to the borrower's attorneys office on 2/21/2020.; Filed By: Lawrence, P.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE A/K/A DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Holland, R.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE - VACANT - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF LE PREMIER CONDOMINIUM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Bilski, C.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JACQUELINE POGUE A/K/A JACQUELINE TANNER A/K/A JACQUELINE NGUYEN POGUE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less