This case was last updated from Oswego County Courts on 11/04/2020 at 07:15:44 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC. v. UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SHERRY FRANCE IF LIVING, AND IF HE/SHE BE DEAD, ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF, CLAIMING, OR WHO MAY CLAIM TO HAVE AN INTEREST IN, OR GENERAL OR SPECIFIC LIEN UPON THE REAL PROPERTY DESCR

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SHERRY FRANCE IF LIVING, AND IF HE/SHE BE DEAD, ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF, CLAIMING, OR WHO MAY CLAIM TO HAVE AN INTEREST IN, OR GENERAL OR SPECIFIC LIEN UPON THE REAL PROPERTY DESCR. This case was filed in Oswego County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1187

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Oswego, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

Sherry France

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Revenue Service Internal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

FAY, RICHARD PATRICK

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

Defendant Attorney

LANGAN, MARY ELIZABETH

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Langan, M.; Filed: 10/21/2020; Received: 10/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing Aff - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing Aff - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/15/2020; Received: 10/15/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/15/2020; Received: 10/15/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fay, R.; Filed: 10/29/2020; Received: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Langan, M.; Filed: 10/21/2020; Received: 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOES AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mailing Aff - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH THE IRS; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/20/2020; Received: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/15/2020; Received: 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service People of the State of New York; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/15/2020; Received: 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 10/05/2020; Received: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less