This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 17:05:24 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC. v. CAROL PALMER et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CAROL PALMER. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0868

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

Kyle Riedy -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Wesley Schunk

Carol Palmer -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

Kelly Beers -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

WESTERN DIVISION FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

CHAUTAUQUA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

Ashley Neratko -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

Lauren Palmer -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

NEW CITY FUNDING CORP

Amy Kiley -HEIR AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

ESTATE OF DAVID PALMER

SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOODS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

DIDONE, KYLE C

Attorney at RUPP, BAASE, PFALZGRAF, CUNNINGHAM & COPPOLA LLC

DAVISON-MARCH, REBECCA L.

Attorney at Chautauqua County Department of Health and Human Services

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 1-15-20. Mailed 12-10-19.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 1-15-20. Mailed 12-10-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Add Defendant

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Add Defendant; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Appearance and Waiver

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Appearance and Waiver; Filed By: Didone, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Waiver

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Waiver; Filed By: Didone, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASHLEY NERATKO AS HEIR(3215)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASHLEY NERATKO AS HEIR(3215); Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Complaint-Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Complaint-Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Complaint-Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Complaint-Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Homeowners' notice 1-15-20. Mailed 12-10-19.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Counsel notice 1-15-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Add Defendant; Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Appearance and Waiver; Filed By: Didone, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES Notice of Appearance and Waiver; Filed By: Didone, K.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASHLEY NERATKO AS HEIR(3215); Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ASHLEY NERATKO AS HEIR; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2019; Received: 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA ACTING THRU THE SECRETARY OF HUD SERVICE; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C to Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B to Complaint-Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Complaint-Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less