This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:07:46 (UTC).

RETAIL CAPITAL LLC - v. - GO ENERGY MARKETING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 RETAIL CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GO ENERGY MARKETING, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAIL CAPITAL LLC d/b/a CREDIBLY

Defendants

GO ENERGY MARKETING, LLC

Mark Young

Not Yet Classified

Avanzino & Moreno, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER, PETER B

Attorney at FOSTER & WOLKIND, P.C.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

AVANZINO, JOHN K.

Attorney at AVANZINO & MORENO, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) With Blueback

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) With Blueback; Filed By: Avanzino, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Contains Exhibit A

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Contains Exhibit A; Filed By: Avanzino, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

BILL OF COSTS *Corrected* BILL OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS

BILL OF COSTS *Corrected* BILL OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT-corrected

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT-corrected; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT DTD 3/8/2018

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT DTD 3/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AGREEMENT (REDACTED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AGREEMENT (REDACTED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARK YOUNG

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARK YOUNG; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service upon corporate defendant

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service upon corporate defendant; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) With Blueback; Filed By: Avanzino, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Contains Exhibit A; Filed By: Avanzino, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS *Corrected* BILL OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) *Corrected* JUDGMENT-corrected; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER WITH AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT DTD 3/8/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF MAILING OF A COPY OF THE SUMMONS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AGREEMENT (REDACTED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MARK YOUNG; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service upon corporate defendant; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Foster, P.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less