***********1960
07/26/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Jefferson, New York
RENT-A-CENTER
Joshua Mikeals
Gladys Lamb
MELNICOFF, JOEL N
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 07/26/2022; Received: 07/26/2022
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2022; Received: 09/06/2022
COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2022; Received: 10/12/2022
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2022; Received: 12/15/2022
DocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/15/2022; Received: 12/15/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2022; Received: 10/12/2022
[-] Read LessDocketADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2022; Received: 09/06/2022
[-] Read LessDocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022
[-] Read LessDocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 08/30/2022; Received: 08/30/2022
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Melnicoff, J.; Filed: 07/26/2022; Received: 07/26/2022
[-] Read Less