This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 16:39:25 (UTC).

Remona Linton - v. - KINGS AUTO LEASING et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 Remona Linton filed an Other lawsuit against KINGS AUTO LEASING. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Remona Linton

Defendants

FINANCIAL SERVICES LEASE TRUST

KINGS AUTO LEASING

Michellele M Mccarthy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINDER, MICHAEL

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Binder, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

ISSERLIS, NANCY L

Attorney at NANCY L ISSERLIS

KELLY, EDWARD JOSEPH

Attorney at Kelly, Rode & Kelly LLP

PRUSIECKI, JENNIFER

Attorney at Kelly Rode & Kelly, LLP

DELATORRE, MATTHEW SCOTT

Attorney at Moritt, Hock & Hamroff, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5); Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #5) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #5) Note of Issue; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #5) Deposition Transcript McCarthy

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #5) Deposition Transcript McCarthy; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Photographs; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Plaintiff Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Plaintiff Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Order; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Verified Answer; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Verified Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Verified Answer; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Delatorre, M. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Delatorre, M. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kelly, E. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kelly, E. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D & I Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D & I Demands; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5); Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #5) Note of Issue; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #5) Deposition Transcript McCarthy; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Photographs; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Plaintiff Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Order; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Verified Answer; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Verified Answer; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Prusiecki, J. - filed by Kelly, Rode & kelly, LLP; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Delatorre, M. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Delatorre, M. - filed by Kelly, Rode & Kelly; Filed: 01/25/2018; Received: 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 01/22/2018; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kelly, E. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kelly, E. - filed by Kelly Rode & Kelly LLP; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D & I Demands; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Binder, M.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less