This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:16:41 (UTC).

Reliance First Capital, LLC v. Brian M. Sech et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Reliance First Capital, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brian M Sech. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2005

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reliance First Capital, LLC

Defendants

Brian M. Sech

John Doe

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Information as requested in Settlement Conference Notice

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Information as requested in Settlement Conference Notice; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SRJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 09/01/2022; Received: 09/01/2022

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: OCCUPANT; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: LEANNA ELIOPOLOUS SHA MARY ROE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: LEANNA ELIOPOLOUS SHA MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E AOM

EXHIBIT(S) - E AOM; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Information as requested in Settlement Conference Notice; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 10/11/2022; Received: 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/07/2022; Received: 09/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 09/01/2022; Received: 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 08/26/2022; Received: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: OCCUPANT; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING TO: LEANNA ELIOPOLOUS SHA MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LEANNA ELIOPOLOUS SHA MARY ROE #1; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 08/17/2022; Received: 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E AOM; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less