Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:33:47 (UTC).

Regional Acceptance Corporation - v. - William F Belitz

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 Regional Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against William F Belitz. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0860

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regional Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

William F Belitz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, MARK H

Attorney at LACY KATZEN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Military status

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

ORDER - AWARDING FEE

ORDER - AWARDING FEE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #01) Affidavit of additional mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #01) Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #01) Affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #01) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #01) Military status

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #01) Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01)

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #01) Affidavit of additional mailing; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #01) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #01) Military status; Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, M. - filed by Carney, S.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint with Verification and Supporting Documentation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, M.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less