This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 14:43:44 (UTC).

Regional Acceptance Corporation v. Latessa K. Slade et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Regional Acceptance Corporation filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Latessa K Slade. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regional Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Latessa K. Slade a/k/a Latessa Slade

Clive C. Fraser a/k/a Clive Fraser

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANO, PILAR A

Attorney at Powhida & Cano, PLLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing (both debtors)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing (both debtors); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Explanation of Calculation of Surplus or Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Explanation of Calculation of Surplus or Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Additional Mailing (both debtors); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement of Judgment and Affidavit of Account; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Explanation of Calculation of Surplus or Deficiency and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Retail Installment Contract; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cano, P.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less