This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 14:09:58 (UTC).

Regina L. Marker et al v. Sidney E. Syracuse et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Regina L Marker filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sidney E Syracuse. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2022

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Regina L. Marker

Timothy Marker

Defendants

Sidney E. Syracuse

Regina Syracuse

Matthew J. Pusateri

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'BRIEN, CHRISTOPHER J.

Defendant Attorneys

Fazili, Sareer A

CAGGIANO, ROBERT JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sidney Syracuse

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sidney Syracuse; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Regina Syracuse

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Regina Syracuse; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Matthew Pusateri

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Matthew Pusateri; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIMS AND VARIOUS DEMANDS FOR DISCOVERY

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIMS AND VARIOUS DEMANDS FOR DISCOVERY; Filed By: Fazili, S. - filed by LAW OFFICES OF BURATTI, ROTHENBERG & BURNS; Filed: 12/27/2022; Received: 12/27/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fazili, S. - filed by LAW OFFICES OF BURATTI, ROTHENBERG & BURNS; Filed: 12/27/2022; Received: 12/27/2022

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Caggiano, R.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Caggiano, R.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fazili, S. - filed by LAW OFFICES OF BURATTI, ROTHENBERG & BURNS; Filed: 12/27/2022; Received: 12/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIMS AND VARIOUS DEMANDS FOR DISCOVERY; Filed By: Fazili, S. - filed by LAW OFFICES OF BURATTI, ROTHENBERG & BURNS; Filed: 12/27/2022; Received: 12/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Matthew Pusateri; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Regina Syracuse; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sidney Syracuse; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 12/12/2022; Received: 12/12/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: O'Brien, C.; Filed: 11/22/2022; Received: 11/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less