Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 16:12:05 (UTC).

REDIFORM FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. EDWARD ZURBUCH JR.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 REDIFORM FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWARD ZURBUCH JR. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDIFORM FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Edward Zurbuch JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Signed

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less