This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:37:37 (UTC).

RED CEDAR POINT ASSOCIATION, INC. - v. - DANIEL RIENZO et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 RED CEDAR POINT ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL RIENZO. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED CEDAR POINT ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

Daniel Rienzo

Gali Rienzo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDHABER, ROBERT D

Attorney at ROSENTHAL & GOLDHABER P.C. ATTORNEYS AND COUNSELLORS AT LAW

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B copy of original judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - B copy of original judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons, complaint & affidavits of service

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons, complaint & affidavits of service; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proposed Renewal Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proposed Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B copy of original judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons, complaint & affidavits of service; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 10/11/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Proposed Renewal Judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Judgment; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Goldhaber, R.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less