Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 00:11:34 (UTC).

REBECCA WINSTON - v. - DAVE DWORETZKY LAWNCARE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 REBECCA WINSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVE DWORETZKY LAWNCARE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca Winston

Defendants

DAVE DWORETZKY LAWNCARE, INC.

Philip Spindler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSLEY, RICHARD ALAN

Attorney at RICHARD ALAN BERNSLEY ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

SHERWIN, JEFFREY D.

Attorney at MACVEAN LEWIS SHERWIN & MCDERMOTT PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 02/12/2018; Received: 02/12/2018

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 02/12/2018; Received: 02/12/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 02/09/2018; Received: 02/09/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Dave Dworetzky Lawncare

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Dave Dworetzky Lawncare; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

DEMAND FOR: Revocation of Consent to Service by Fax

DEMAND FOR: Revocation of Consent to Service by Fax; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Revocation of Consent to service by fax

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Revocation of Consent to service by fax; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c)

DEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c); Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Omnibus Demand

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Omnibus Demand; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Spindler

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Spindler; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DSS

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DSS; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 02/12/2018; Received: 02/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 02/12/2018; Received: 02/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 02/09/2018; Received: 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Dave Dworetzky Lawncare; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Omnibus Demand; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Revocation of Consent to Service by Fax; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Revocation of Consent to service by fax; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 3017(c); Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Omnibus Demand; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sherwin, J.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service - Spindler; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DSS; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bernsley, R.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less