This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:12:01 (UTC).

R.B. Woodcraft, Inc. - v. - William H. Lane Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 R B Woodcraft, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against William H Lane Incorporated. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0103

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R.B. Woodcraft, Inc.

Defendants

William H. Lane Incorporated

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONALD, GREGORY J

Attorney at BOND, SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

MILLUS, ALBERT JOHN

Attorney at HINMAN HOWARD & KATTELL, L.L.P.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

NOTICE Pre-Trial Conference by phone scheduled for 10/18/19 at 11:30 a.m.

NOTICE Pre-Trial Conference by phone scheduled for 10/18/19 at 11:30 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY *Corrected*

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting Extension of Discovery Deadline

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting Extension of Discovery Deadline; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Millus, A.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on William H. Lane Incorporated

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on William H. Lane Incorporated; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Discharge Bond

EXHIBIT(S) - C Discharge Bond; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond

EXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanic's Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanic's Lien; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Pre-Trial Conference by phone scheduled for 10/18/19 at 11:30 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting Extension of Discovery Deadline; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 08/31/2018; Received: 08/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2018; Received: 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Millus, A.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on William H. Lane Incorporated; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Discharge Bond; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Payment Bond; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanic's Lien; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mcdonald, G.; Filed: 06/13/2017; Received: 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less