Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 02:38:57 (UTC).

Ravi Bollu et al - v. - District Attorney of Steuben County Brooks T. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 Ravi Bollu filed an Other lawsuit against District Attorney of Steuben County Brooks T Baker. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********31CV

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manoj Verma

Udekwu Sylvie Manzembe

Michael Panico

Slyvie M Udekwu

Maroldis P Martinex

Mujo Muriqi

Ravi Bollu

Sarah Shureb

Martinez Maroldis Parra

Tsehaye N Tareke

Defendants

County district Attorney Steuben

Town Justice Prattsburgh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN, ZEV

Attorney at The Law Offices of Zev Goldstein, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

REED, ALAN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) includes Exhibit A

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) includes Exhibit A; Filed By: Reed, A.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Reed, A.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)

ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Response to CPLR arguments

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Response to CPLR arguments; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Re-Service with new date, Rejected by DA, directed service on County Attorney's Office

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Re-Service with new date, Rejected by DA, directed service on County Attorney's Office; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Karan Gurnasinghani dismissed, not Moot as to DA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Karan Gurnasinghani dismissed, not Moot as to DA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Manoj Verma not moot as to Brooks Baker

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Manoj Verma not moot as to Brooks Baker; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1) New date of 8/13/18 10:30 am

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1) New date of 8/13/18 10:30 am; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service on County Attorney

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service on County Attorney; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G Justice Hortons Decision and Order granting discovery

EXHIBIT(S) - G Justice Hortons Decision and Order granting discovery; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F Motion practice in People v Bollu on Remand

EXHIBIT(S) - F Motion practice in People v Bollu on Remand; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E DA Baker's letter that Justice Roche could not interpret CPL 340.50(2)

EXHIBIT(S) - E DA Baker's letter that Justice Roche could not interpret CPL 340.50(2); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Appellate Briefs in People v Bollu Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Appellate Briefs in People v Bollu Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Decision on Appeal, People v. Bollu, (Steuben County Court, J. Roche, decided May 16, 2018)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Decision on Appeal, People v. Bollu, (Steuben County Court, J. Roche, decided May 16, 2018); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Opinion, Decision and Order of Justice Coombs, Prattsburgh Town Court

EXHIBIT(S) - B Opinion, Decision and Order of Justice Coombs, Prattsburgh Town Court; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Motion Practice in the Prattsburgh Town Court Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Motion Practice in the Prattsburgh Town Court Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) includes Exhibit A; Filed By: Reed, A.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Reed, A.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FINAL (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2018; Received: 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Response to CPLR arguments; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Re-Service with new date, Rejected by DA, directed service on County Attorney's Office; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 08/09/2018; Received: 08/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Karan Gurnasinghani dismissed, not Moot as to DA Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Manoj Verma not moot as to Brooks Baker; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) (Motion #1) New date of 8/13/18 10:30 am; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/19/2018; Received: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of service on County Attorney; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Moot as to J. Coombs; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/11/2018; Received: 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H DA Baker's letter, no more ADA plea deals; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Justice Hortons Decision and Order granting discovery; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Motion practice in People v Bollu on Remand; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E DA Baker's letter that Justice Roche could not interpret CPL 340.50(2); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Appellate Briefs in People v Bollu Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Decision on Appeal, People v. Bollu, (Steuben County Court, J. Roche, decided May 16, 2018); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Opinion, Decision and Order of Justice Coombs, Prattsburgh Town Court; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Motion Practice in the Prattsburgh Town Court Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldstein, Z.; Filed: 07/10/2018; Received: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less