Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 18:04:21 (UTC).

Randy James - v. - Joseph Faso

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 Randy James filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Joseph Faso. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy James

Defendant

Joseph Faso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHELTON, ERIC MOORE

Attorney at Brown Chiari

Defendant Attorney

GOODMAN, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

January 10 correspondence

EXHIBIT(S)

Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS on Faso

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) January 10 correspondence; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Goodman, D.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS on Faso; Filed By: Shelton, E.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shelton, E.; Filed: 04/24/2017; Received: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less