This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:16:21 (UTC).

QUICKEN LOANS INC. v. JEFFREY D'ALBERO et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 QUICKEN LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JEFFREY D'ALBERO. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUICKEN LOANS INC.

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Jeffrey D'albero

and JOHN DOE and MARY DOE, (said names being fictitious, it being the intention of plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclosed he

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, HEATHER C

Attorney at DAVIDSON, FINK, LLP

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATEN ISLAND UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less