This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 19:26:50 (UTC).

QUEEN FUNDING LLC - v. - SIGNATURE FITNESS CLUB INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 QUEEN FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIGNATURE FITNESS CLUB INC. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEEN FUNDING LLC

Defendants

SIGNATURE FITNESS CLUB INC

Sheldon Botha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINSTEIN, ISRAEL DOV

Attorney at Weinstein & Weinstein, LLP

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/16/2018; Received: 08/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 08/15/2018; Received: 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less