This case was last updated from Ontario County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:27:48 (UTC).

QUEEN FUNDING LLC v. INSIGHT DIAGNOSTICS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 QUEEN FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INSIGHT DIAGNOSTICS LLC. This case was filed in Ontario County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ontario County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Ontario, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEEN FUNDING LLC

Defendants

Joseph Ferrio

INSIGHT DIAGNOSTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINSTEIN, ISRAEL DOV

Attorney at Weinstein & Weinstein, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT

STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT); Filed By: Weinstein, I.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less