This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 12:43:55 (UTC).

PROSPERUM CAPITAL LLC v. THE GRILL AND DELI, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 PROSPERUM CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE GRILL AND DELI, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROSPERUM CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

THE GRILL AND DELI, INC. dba THE GRILL AND DELI

Fadi Nafeh Soro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORG, MICHAEL ALAN

Attorney at SOFFER, RECH & BORG, LLP

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less