This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 02:50:38 (UTC).

PROSPERUM CAPITAL, LLC v. EMR TRUCKING & SONS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 PROSPERUM CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMR TRUCKING SONS, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROSPERUM CAPITAL, LLC

Defendants

EMR TRUCKING & SONS, INC. dba EMR TRUCKING & SONS

Edward Michael Rodriguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORG, MICHAEL ALAN

Attorney at SOFFER, RECH & BORG, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE JUDGMENT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE JUDGMENT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED); Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT; Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Borg, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less