This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:09:08 (UTC).

Propel Financial 1, LLC - v. - Michael F. Harris, as Administrator of the Estate of Katherine V. Harris a/k/a Kathy Harris et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 Propel Financial 1, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael F Harris, as Administrator of the Estate of Katherine. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jscott Odorisi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0660

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jscott Odorisi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Propel Financial 1, LLC

Defendants

John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 100 inclusive, the names of the last 100 defendants being fictitious, the true names of said defendants being unknown to plaintiff, it being intended to designate fee owners, tenants or occupants of the liened prem

Board of Managers of Woodhill Condominium

Woodhill Condominiuim

Asset Acceptance LLC APO HSBC

Board of Directors of Woodhill Condominium Association Inc

Benjamin Harris

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Tax Compliance Division

Kathryn Harris

Michael F. Harris

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Unifund CCR Partners

Woodhill Condominium Association Inc

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Department of Treasury

Donald Parker

Timothy Harris

individual defendants be dead, their heirs at law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, trustees, committees, devisees, legatees, and the assignees, lienors, creditors and successors in interest of them, and generally all persons hav

United States of America Internal Revenue Service

The People of the State of New York

The City Court of Rochester

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL H

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP

ZACHARIAS, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at Bronster, LLP

TARAB, MARGARET BURKE

Attorney at PINCUS LAW GROUP, PLLC.

Defendant Attorney

CERRONE, MICHAEL SALVATORE

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Foreclosure And Sale

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Foreclosure And Sale; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee's Report

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee's Report; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

OATH Referee's Oath

OATH Referee's Oath; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Tax Lien Assignments

EXHIBIT(S) - G Tax Lien Assignments; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Order Substituting Referee

EXHIBIT(S) - F Order Substituting Referee; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Order Appointing Referee to Compute

EXHIBIT(S) - E Order Appointing Referee to Compute; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC S/H/A ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC APO HSBC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC S/H/A ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC APO HSBC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - f Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - f Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - e Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - e Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - d Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - d Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - c Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - c Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Foreclosure And Sale; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee's Report; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH Referee's Oath; Filed By: Zacharias, M.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Tax Lien Assignments; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Order Substituting Referee; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Order Appointing Referee to Compute; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC S/H/A ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC APO HSBC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - f Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - e Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - d Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 05/03/2017; Received: 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less