Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:44:53 (UTC).

Propel Financial 1, LLC - v. - JOSE RICARDO SANTIAGO et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 Propel Financial 1, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOSE RICARDO SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1960

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Propel Financial 1, LLC

Defendants

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

Jose Ricardo Santiago a/k/a JOSE SANTIAGO, JR. a/k/a JAY SANTIAGO a/k/a JOSE SANTIAGO a/k/a JOSEPH SANTIAGO a/k/a J. SANTIAGO

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

Jeffrey Henchen

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

Victor Diaz

individual defendants be dead, their heirs at law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, trustees, committees, devisees, legatees, and the assignees, lienors, creditors and successors in interest of them, and generally all persons hav

John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 100 inclusive, the names of the last 100 defendants being fictitious, the true names of said defendants being unknown to plaintiff, it being intended to designate fee owners, tenants or occupants of the liened prem

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

FLEET NATIONAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL H

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF LLP

RESNIKOFF, MICHAEL HUNTER

Attorney at BRONSTER LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WALLS, MICHELE M

Attorney at NYS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

NAPOLITANO, LORENZO

Attorney at Lorenzo Napolitano

CERRONE, MICHAEL SALVATORE

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

FEMMINELLA, NICOLE P

Attorney at FRENKEL, LAMBERT, WEISS, WEISMAN & GORDON, LLP

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Napolitano, L.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Femminella, N.; Filed: 04/12/2018; Received: 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 12/05/2017; Received: 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Napolitano, L.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Cerrone, M.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Resnikoff, M. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Resnikoff, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less