This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 14:27:27 (UTC).

Progressive Advanced Insurance Company as subrogee of Sarah Maynard v. Town of Dryden et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Progressive Advanced Insurance Company as subrogee of Sarah Maynard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Town of Dryden. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0110

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Advanced Insurance Company as subrogee of Sarah Maynard

Defendants

Dustin Richard Card

Town of Dryden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN, JODI PAIGE

Attorney at FELDMAN & FELDMAN, LLP

Defendant Attorney

O'BRIEN, JAMES P.

Attorney at COUGHLIN & GERHART LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE Notice of 4/6/20 11:30 a.m. telephone conference

NOTICE Notice of 4/6/20 11:30 a.m. telephone conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: O'Brien, J.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of RJI, Request for PC and Affirmation of Good Faith with litigation back

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of RJI, Request for PC and Affirmation of Good Faith with litigation back; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: O'Brien, J.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Notice of 4/6/20 11:30 a.m. telephone conference; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: O'Brien, J.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of RJI, Request for PC and Affirmation of Good Faith with litigation back; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: O'Brien, J.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Feldman, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less