This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 01:47:51 (UTC).

PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY - v. - CHRISTOPHER O. RODRIGUEZ et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIMELENDING, A PLAINSCAPITAL COMPANY

Defendants

Christopher O. Rodriguez

John Doe #1 to #10, the last 10 names being fictitious and unknown to plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the persons or parties, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the mortgaged premises described in the complaint,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOSATO, MELISSA A.

Attorney at MCCABE WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

Defendant Attorney

ROSADO, GISELE CAMIELLE

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) Notice of pendency

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) Notice of pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) affirmation; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) order to discontinue scanned

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) order to discontinue scanned; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of motion scanned

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of motion scanned; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM CHRISTOPHER O. RODRIGUEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM CHRISTOPHER O. RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) Notice of pendency; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of service; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) affirmation; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) order to discontinue scanned; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of motion scanned; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Defendant's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories; Filed By: Rosado, G.; Filed: 05/14/2018; Received: 05/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 CHRISTOPHER O. RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM CHRISTOPHER O. RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 02/08/2018; Received: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHRISTOPHER O RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: Sposato, M. - filed by Expedited Legal Support Services, Inc.; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sposato, M.; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less