This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 11/17/2021 at 17:19:33 (UTC).

Pride Park Holdings, LLC v. Keri Mead et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Pride Park Holdings, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Keri Mead. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Eugene D Faughnan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0227

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Eugene D Faughnan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pride Park Holdings, LLC c/o Sall Associates, Ltd

Sall associates, Ltd C/o

Defendants

Reyad Mohamed

Keri Mead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEFAZIO, KIMBERLEE NOELLE

Attorney at Aswad & Ingraham, LLP

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) bill of costs

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) bill of costs; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) statement for services

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) statement for services; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavits of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavits of mailing; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mead

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mead; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mohamed

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mohamed; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Mohamed

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Mohamed; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Keri Mead

PROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Keri Mead; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - E invoices; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D mobile home sign-over

EXHIBIT(S) - D mobile home sign-over; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Process server fees

EXHIBIT(S) - C Process server fees; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ledger

EXHIBIT(S) - B Ledger; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease Agreement; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/28/2021; Received: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) bill of costs; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) statement for services; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavits of mailing; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 04/26/2021; Received: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mead; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of service re: Mohamed; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Mohamed; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing re: Keri Mead; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 03/11/2021; Received: 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E invoices; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D mobile home sign-over; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Process server fees; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Ledger; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Lease Agreement; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Defazio, K.; Filed: 01/27/2021; Received: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less