This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 12:52:44 (UTC).

Premier Genesee Health & Rehabilitation Center v. Mary Jean McJury et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 Premier Genesee Health Rehabilitation Center filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mary Jean McJury. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles N Zambito. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7189

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Charles N Zambito

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premier Genesee Health & Rehabilitation Center

Defendants

Mary Jean Mcjury

Daniel Mcjury

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUITRAGO, MARCELO ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service -Daniel & Mary

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service -Daniel & Mary; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service - Daniel

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service - Daniel; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - RJI; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Buitrago, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order to Extend Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) to Extend Time to Serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - RJI; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service - Daniel; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Attempted Service -Daniel & Mary; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less