This case was last updated from Genesee County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 13:43:15 (UTC).

Premier Genesee Health & Rehabilitation Center v. David Pahuta

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 Premier Genesee Health Rehabilitation Center filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against David Pahuta. This case was filed in Genesee County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles N Zambito. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7187

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Genesee, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Charles N Zambito

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premier Genesee Health & Rehabilitation Center

Defendant

David Pahuta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUITRAGO, MARCELO ALEJANDRO

Defendant Attorney

Walsh, Theresa M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons with Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons with Notice; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C Complaint; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Complaint; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons with Notice; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walsh, T.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Buitrago, M.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less