This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 04:28:39 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,LLC v. STEPHANIE SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHANIE SMITH. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0156

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendant

Stephanie Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

JORDAN, TARAH EVE

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E314437264344

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E314437264344; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jordan, T.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT E314437264344; Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less