This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 16:14:26 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC - v. - JENNIFER PRISCO

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JENNIFER PRISCO. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

Jennifer Prisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

GUNTHER, TESS E

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Martin, Joe Charles

Attorney at Conn & Bryant

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gunther, T.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Martin, J.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E311372100254 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E311372100254 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gunther, T.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Martin, J.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT E311372100254 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less