This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:31:20 (UTC).

Port Plaza (E&A) LLC, - v. - Brookhaven, Town of

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Port Plaza E A LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Brookhaven, Town of. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Port Plaza (E&A) LLC,

Defendant

Brookhaven, Town of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILKES, DAVID

Attorney at Herman Katz Cangemi Wilkes & Clyne, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE

NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

PETITION Notice of Petition and Petition

PETITION Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Notice of Petition and Petition; Filed By: Wilkes, D.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less