This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:58:56 (UTC).

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. SALVATORE BASILE et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SALVATORE BASILE. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

RICHMOND SUPREME COURT

NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

John Doe

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

Nicole A Basile AKA NICOLE KELLY

KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM

Salvatore Basile

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ, JORDAN S

Attorney at JORDAN S. KATZ AND ASSOCIATES, PC

LANDRIGAN, KYLE EDWARD

Attorney at Aldridge Pite LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Cancelation of Notice of Pendency

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Cancelation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Discontinuing Action

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Canceling Lis Pendens

AFFIRMATION Affirmation Canceling Lis Pendens; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALVATORE BASILE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALVATORE BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing Cancelation of Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/22/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation Canceling Lis Pendens; Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Landrigan, K.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NICOLE A. BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALVATORE BASILE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by ProVest LLC; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHMOND SUPREME COURT; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF KINGS WALK CONDOMINIUM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less