This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 08:56:39 (UTC).

Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing et al v. CHRISTINE OETZEL et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTINE OETZEL. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PINE VALLEY CENTER, LLC d/b/a Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing

PINE VALLEY CENTER LLC-DBA

Pine Valley Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing

Defendants

Stacy Mott as Power of Attorney for Christine Oetzel

Christine Oetzel

Stacy Mott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERVIS, HARVEY D.

Attorney at HINMAN HOWARD AND KATTELL

Defendant Attorney

OSTRER, BENJAMIN

Attorney at OSTRER & ASSOCIATES P.C

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Admission Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Admission Agreement; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Oetzel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Oetzel; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Mott

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Mott; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Ostrer, B.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Ostrer, B.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Invoice; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Admission Agreement; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Oetzel; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Mott; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Ostrer, B.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Ostrer, B.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Mervis, H.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less