This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:56:29 (UTC).

PIERRE FLOREXILE - v. - BRENT SIMON

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 PIERRE FLOREXILE filed an Other lawsuit against BRENT SIMON. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierre Florexile

Defendant

Brent Simon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYKO, YEKATERINA

Attorney at BOYKO & ASSOCIATES, P.C. ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

IERVASI, ROCCO

Attorney at James F. Butler & Associates

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) stip of disc

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) stip of disc; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/23/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Boyko, Y.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

ANSWER answer with demands

ANSWER answer with demands; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boyko, Y.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING authorization-ol

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING authorization-ol; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) stip of disc; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/23/2018; Received: 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING authorization-ol; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer with demands; Filed By: Iervasi, R. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service; Filed By: Boyko, Y.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boyko, Y.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less