This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

PHULMAT ZAMAN v. HERBERT S. LUCAS et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 PHULMAT ZAMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERBERT S LUCAS. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phulmat Zaman

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Herbert S. Lucas

MTA BUS COMPANY

Sterling Tart

THE METROPLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

RMG LEASING CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID, MARYELLEN

SEARS, STUART LEE

Defendant Attorneys

GRIMALDI, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

GOODOVITCH, PAUL IAN

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Stipulation of Substitution

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Stipulation of Substitution; Filed By: Grimaldi, C.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Grimaldi, C.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B18 (Motion #002) Marks pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - B18 (Motion #002) Marks pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B17 (Motion #002) Mohamed pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - B17 (Motion #002) Mohamed pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B16 (Motion #002) Appana pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - B16 (Motion #002) Appana pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B15 (Motion #002) Wanamaker Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B15 (Motion #002) Wanamaker Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B14 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Zaman action

EXHIBIT(S) - B14 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Zaman action; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B13 (Motion #002) Zaman Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B13 (Motion #002) Zaman Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B12 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Kumar action

EXHIBIT(S) - B12 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Kumar action; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answers; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Stipulation of Substitution; Filed By: Grimaldi, C.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Grimaldi, C.; Filed: 08/14/2020; Received: 08/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B18 (Motion #002) Marks pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B17 (Motion #002) Mohamed pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B16 (Motion #002) Appana pleadings; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B15 (Motion #002) Wanamaker Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B14 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Zaman action; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B13 (Motion #002) Zaman Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B12 (Motion #002) Lucas/RMG Answer Kumar action; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B11 (Motion #002) Kumar Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Goodovitch, P.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answers; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 07/23/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Sears, S.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less