Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/29/2020 at 12:25:14 (UTC).

PHILOMENA SOPER, as Administratrix for the Estate of ALVIN J. SOPER, and PHILOMENA SOPER, Individually v. ABB, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 PHILOMENA SOPER, as Administratrix for the Estate of ALVIN J SOPER, and PHILOMENA SOPER, Individually filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILOMENA SOPER, as Administratrix for the Estate of ALVIN J. SOPER, and PHILOMENA SOPER, Individually

Defendants

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.,

ABB, INC.

FMC CORPORATION,

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC (DELAWARE)

CRANE CO.,

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC., successor in interest to

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

GARDNER DENVER, INC

COOPER CROUSE-HINDS,

LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., as successor in interest

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC

BRYANT HEATING & COOLING SYSTEMS

CARRIER CORPORATION

GOULD ELECTRONICS INC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DREKSLER, ADAM SEAN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

KAUFMAN, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

CURTIS, MICHAEL JAMES

COTTLE, ERIC R

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

SCHAEFER, ROBERT ANTHONY

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

MACSTEEL, GENEVIEVE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

KIM, MORAE

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

LASALA, JOSEPH P

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

ROWAN, MEGAN

Attorney at DEYB

POWERS, NATALIE ANN

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

MERCHANT, JOEL ALEXANDER

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

RUGGERI, SAM VICTOR

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF; Filed By: Kaufman, D.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service for USJM - Def Siemens

PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service for USJM - Def Siemens; Filed By: Howarth, J.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for USJM to Plaintiffs' Attorney on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc.

DEMAND FOR: Demand for USJM to Plaintiffs' Attorney on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc.; Filed By: Howarth, J.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY CompuDyne, LLC Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY CompuDyne, LLC Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

ANSWER Eaton's Answer

ANSWER Eaton's Answer; Filed By: Ferstendig, G.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims; Filed By: Smithens, D.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 POF; Filed By: Kaufman, D.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service for USJM - Def Siemens; Filed By: Howarth, J.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for USJM to Plaintiffs' Attorney on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc.; Filed By: Howarth, J.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY CompuDyne, LLC Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Leviton Manufacturing Co.; Filed By: Ruggeri, S.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Eaton's Answer; Filed By: Ferstendig, G.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Gould Electronics Inc., Acknowledgment of Service and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kim, M.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Lennox Industries Answer with Cross Claims; Filed By: Smithens, D.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fuller, B.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less