Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 18:02:01 (UTC).

PHILLIP ROSA - v. - MARY E TRAPINI et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 PHILLIP ROSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARY E TRAPINI. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Rosa

Defendants

Marco Tulio Lopez

ENAP INC.

David M Merryman

Yeny M Menjivar

Richard J Trapini

Divyesh I Patel

Mary E Trapini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHOENBERG, RICHARD B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN TROP

SHEEHAN, DENNIS P.

Attorney at HINMAN. HOWARD & KATTELL, LLP

WILSON, SARAH NICOLE

BERGIN, SCOTT D.

Attorney at MCCABE & MACK LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Vazquez-Doles and Request for Adjournment Form

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Vazquez-Doles and Request for Adjournment Form; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

ANSWER Answer and Demands

ANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT Tulia Aff

AFFIDAVIT Tulia Aff; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Yeny Menjivar

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Yeny Menjivar; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MARCO TULIO LOPEZ

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MARCO TULIO LOPEZ; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Bergin, S.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Vazquez-Doles and Request for Adjournment Form; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Schoenberg, R.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Tulia Aff; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sheehan, D.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Yeny Menjivar; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MARCO TULIO LOPEZ; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Bergin, S.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/17/2017; Received: 05/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/04/2017; Received: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less