This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 17:51:17 (UTC).

Phi Financial Services Inc - v. - Fairdawn Farms Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 Phi Financial Services Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fairdawn Farms Inc. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1060

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phi Financial Services Inc

Defendants

Fairdawn Farms Inc

Douglas L Fairbanks

Douglas J Fairbanks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAIDENBAUM, JEFFREY A

Attorney at MAIDENBAUM & ASSOCIATES P.L.L.C.

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 12/27/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas L Fairbanks

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas L Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas J. Fairbanks

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas J. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on the corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on the corporation; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

AFFIRMATION non military on douglas l fairbanks

AFFIRMATION non military on douglas l fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

AFFIRMATION non military on douglas j fairbanks

AFFIRMATION non military on douglas j fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas L. Fairbanks

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas L. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas J. Fairbanks

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas J. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on the corporation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on the corporation; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas L Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on Douglas J. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE additional mailing on the corporation; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION non military on douglas l fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION non military on douglas j fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketAFFIRMATION additional mailing on douglas l fairbanks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketAFFIRMATION additional mailing on douglas j fairbanks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketAFFIRMATION additional mailing on fairdawn farms inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas L. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Douglas J. Fairbanks; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on the corporation; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Maidenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less