This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:06:09 (UTC).

PHH Mortgage Corporation v. John J. Adragna et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 PHH Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against John J Adragna. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

John J. Adragna a/k/a John Adragna

City of New York Parking Violations Bureau

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Christine Adragna

The Oaks at La Tourette Condominium, Section 1

Sustainable Neighborhoods LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARRERA, DANA MARIE

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LERMAN, JENNIFER

Attorney at Staten Island Legal Services

HALPER, STUART A

Attorney at STUART HALPER ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lerman, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM

FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Limited Appearance

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Limited Appearance; Filed By: Lerman, J.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOOD LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOOD LLC; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Halper, S.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Halper, S.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Lerman, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Limited Appearance; Filed By: Lerman, J.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Carrera, D.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOOD LLC; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Halper, S.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Halper, S.; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PARKING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less