Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 17:55:47 (UTC).

Peter R Lorenzo et al - v. - Village of Greenwood Lake et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 Peter R Lorenzo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Village of Greenwood Lake. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria S Vazquezdoles. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Maria S Vazquezdoles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosemarie Lorenzo

Peter R Lorenzo

Defendants

Town of Warwick

Village of Greenwood Lake

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN, PAUL J

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN & GOLDSTEIN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

STEWART, H. M

Attorney at GAMBESKI & FRUM

WAYE, JUDITH ANN

Attorney at Drake Loeb PLLC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Judgment with Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Judgment with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment dated and filed with the Orange County Clerk on December 1, 2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment dated and filed with the Orange County Clerk on December 1, 2017; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Judgment

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Judgment; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Service of Notice of Entry of Nov. 8, 2017 Decision & Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B Service of Notice of Entry of Nov. 8, 2017 Decision & Order; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision & Order of Judge Doles dated November 8, 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision & Order of Judge Doles dated November 8, 2017; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Decision & Order of Hon. Maria Vazquez-Doles dated 11/8/17 and entered with O.C. ... show more

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Decision & Order of Hon. Maria Vazquez-Doles dated 11/8/17 and entered with O.C. ... show more; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stewart, H.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* BILL OF PARTICULARS

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* NOTICE OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* NOTICE OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* POLICE BLOTTER ENTRY T/WARWICK

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* POLICE BLOTTER ENTRY T/WARWICK; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* POLICE ACCIDENT REPORT

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* POLICE ACCIDENT REPORT; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* AMENDED NOTICE OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* AMENDED NOTICE OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF EXPERT

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF EXPERT; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected* NOT OF PET TO FILE LATE NOT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected* NOT OF PET TO FILE LATE NOT OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

PETITION *Corrected* PETITION AND AFFIRMATION

PETITION *Corrected* PETITION AND AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Judgment with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment dated and filed with the Orange County Clerk on December 1, 2017; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Judgment; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Service of Notice of Entry of Nov. 8, 2017 Decision & Order; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision & Order of Judge Doles dated November 8, 2017; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 12/01/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Decision & Order of Hon. Maria Vazquez-Doles dated 11/8/17 and entered with O.C. Clerk on 11/9/17; Filed By: Waye, J.; Filed: 11/10/2017; Received: 11/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Stewart, H.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 *Corrected* BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 *Corrected* NOTICE OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 *Corrected* POLICE BLOTTER ENTRY T/WARWICK; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 *Corrected* POLICE ACCIDENT REPORT; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* AMENDED NOTICE OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF EXPERT; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) *Corrected* NOT OF PET TO FILE LATE NOT OF CLAIM; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected* PETITION AND AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Goldstein, P.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less