This case was last updated from Wayne County Courts on 11/26/2020 at 09:57:47 (UTC).

PETER FRANK V ANDREW CUOMO ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 PETER FRANK filed an Other lawsuit against ANDREW CUOMO. This case was filed in Wayne County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John Nesbitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6319

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Wayne, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John Nesbitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Frank

Defendants

Howard Zucker

Andrew Cuomo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ, CARL JACOB

Attorney at Finger Lakes Law Group

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed OTSC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed OTSC; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 11/22/2020; Received: 11/22/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER Order to Show Cause

RJI -RE: OTHER Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - R Executive Order Statutory and Constitutional Violations

EXHIBIT(S) - R Executive Order Statutory and Constitutional Violations; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - Q NYS Emergency Powers Assembly Legislation

EXHIBIT(S) - Q NYS Emergency Powers Assembly Legislation; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - P NYSDOH Pre-K to Gr 12 Toolkit

EXHIBIT(S) - P NYSDOH Pre-K to Gr 12 Toolkit; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - O Cambridge Coronavirus Collection, Dr. Brown

EXHIBIT(S) - O Cambridge Coronavirus Collection, Dr. Brown; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N CDC Morbidity and Mortality Report, August 14, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N CDC Morbidity and Mortality Report, August 14, 2020; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G The Seattle Times

EXHIBIT(S) - G The Seattle Times; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Washington Examiner: Stanford Doctor

EXHIBIT(S) - F Washington Examiner: Stanford Doctor; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Centers for Disease Control, August 19, 2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Centers for Disease Control, August 19, 2020; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D National Vital Statistics System

EXHIBIT(S) - D National Vital Statistics System; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Dr. Birx: Real Clear Politics

EXHIBIT(S) - C Dr. Birx: Real Clear Politics; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pneumonia and Influenza Mortality Surveillance System

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pneumonia and Influenza Mortality Surveillance System; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Imperial College London

EXHIBIT(S) - A Imperial College London; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Amended Proposed OTSC; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 11/22/2020; Received: 11/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - R Executive Order Statutory and Constitutional Violations; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q NYS Emergency Powers Assembly Legislation; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P NYSDOH Pre-K to Gr 12 Toolkit; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O Cambridge Coronavirus Collection, Dr. Brown; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N CDC Morbidity and Mortality Report, August 14, 2020; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M Dr. Clayton Baker Affidavit; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Monroe County Covid19 Surveillance; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G The Seattle Times; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Washington Examiner: Stanford Doctor; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Centers for Disease Control, August 19, 2020; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D National Vital Statistics System; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Dr. Birx: Real Clear Politics; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Pneumonia and Influenza Mortality Surveillance System; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Imperial College London; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Schwartz, C.; Filed: 10/27/2020; Received: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less