Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 19:22:21 (UTC).

Peter Bigford - v. - Welliver McGuire Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 Peter Bigford filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Welliver McGuire Inc. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Bigford

Defendants

Welliver McGuire Inc.

Weiss/Manfredi Architects L.L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGRATH, KATHERINE M

Attorney at KAZMIERCZUK & MCGRATH

Defendant Attorneys

PRESSMAN, MICHAEL EDMUND

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL E. PRESSMAN

HEGARTY, TIMOTHY FRANCIS

Attorney at ZETLIN & DE CHIARA LLP

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Manfredi A - Agreement

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Hegarty E - GF Letters

EXHIBIT(S)

Hegarty D - Notice to Admit

EXHIBIT(S)

Hegarty C - Community Medical Record

EXHIBIT(S)

Hegarty B - Complaint

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Manfredi A - Agreement; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Hegarty E - GF Letters; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Hegarty D - Notice to Admit Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Hegarty C - Community Medical Record; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Hegarty B - Complaint; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Hegarty A - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Pressman, M.; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Youash, R.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pressman, M.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pressman, M.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mcgrath, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/30/2018; Received: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Slotnick, M.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Slotnick, M.; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mcgrath, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Mcgrath, K. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcgrath, K.; Filed: 10/06/2017; Received: 10/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less