This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:43:21 (UTC).

Pepi Schafler - v. - Esther Summer et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Pepi Schafler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Esther Summer. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pepi Schafler

Defendants

Donald L Summer

Esther Summer INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF DONALD L SUMMER AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONALD L SUMMER TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABRAMOWITZ, PHILIP BERNARD

Attorney at Philip B. Abramowitz, Esq.

KAPLAN, ROBERT MANUEL

Attorney at FERBER CHAN ESSNER & COLLER, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ALOI, FRANCIS A.

Attorney at Frank A. Aloi, Esq.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL

Notice of Appeal

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit A - Discovery Demands to J. Sachs, CPA

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

Reply Affirmation Supporting Motion to Change Venue

EXHIBIT(S)

notice of trust

EXHIBIT(S)

corporate filings

EXHIBIT(S)

correspondence

EXHIBIT(S)

amended complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION

--none--

RJI -RE: OTHER

Notice of Change of Venue

AFFIDAVIT

Esther Summer Affidavit in Support of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County

NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)

Notice of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County

PETITION

Attorney Affirmation

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Discovery Demands to J. Sachs, CPA; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation Supporting Motion to Change Venue; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) notice of trust; Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) corporate filings; Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) correspondence; Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) amended complaint; Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Kaplan, R.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER Notice of Change of Venue; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Esther Summer Affidavit in Support of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Change Venue to Erie County; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Abramowitz, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less