Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 17:32:08 (UTC).

People's Alliance Federal Credit Union v. Ramon A. Ventura

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 People's Alliance Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ramon A Ventura. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People's Alliance Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Ramon A. Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPASANO, NICHOLAS VINCENT

Attorney at NICHOLAS V CAMPASANO

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PRO SE DEFENDANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PRO SE DEFENDANT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

ANSWER PRO SE ANSWER

ANSWER PRO SE ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM RAMON A VENTURA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM RAMON A VENTURA; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS RAMON A VENTURA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS RAMON A VENTURA; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Disbursement Receipt Plus - Increase in LOC

EXHIBIT(S) - D Disbursement Receipt Plus - Increase in LOC; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Disbursement Receipt Plus

EXHIBIT(S) - C Disbursement Receipt Plus; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Application and Credit Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Application and Credit Agreement; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Clipper Checking Account signature card and Statements

EXHIBIT(S) - A Clipper Checking Account signature card and Statements; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PRO SE DEFENDANT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER PRO SE ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM RAMON A VENTURA; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS RAMON A VENTURA; Filed By: Campasano, N. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Disbursement Receipt Plus - Increase in LOC; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Disbursement Receipt Plus; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Application and Credit Agreement; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Clipper Checking Account signature card and Statements; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Campasano, N.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less