This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:43:37 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, TRUSTEES, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, ASSIGNEES,LIENORS, CREDITORS, AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST, AND GENERALLY ALL PERSONS HAVING OR CLAIMING, UNDER

Case Summary

On 05/25/2017 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, TRUSTEES, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, ASSIGNEES,LIENORS, CREDITORS, AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST, AND GENERALLY ALL PERSONS HAVING OR CLAIMING, UNDER. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1015

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Ashley Fox

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AT LAW, NEXT OF KIN, DISTRIBUTEES, EXECUTORS, ADMINISTRATORS, TRUSTEES, DEVISEES, LEGATEES, ASSIGNEES,LIENORS, CREDITORS, AND SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST, AND GENERALLY ALL PERSONS HAVING OR CLAIMING, UNDER, BY OR THROUGH THE DECEDENT LA

Traci Ann Reynolds

Wendy Chargo

Ronnie Fox

Bobby L Fox JR

Brenda L Plumley

William Chargo

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTHERN DISTRICT)

Rachel Chargo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OLSON, KAREN B.

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI & MANFRO LLP

ZAMENHOF, ALEX

Attorney at Knuckles Komosinski & Manfro

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

JOHNSTON, RACHEL LEE

Defendant Attorney

LARKIN, WILLIAM F

Attorney at US ATTORNEYS OFFICE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF N.Y.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #02)

ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING

DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #02)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #02); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Appointment and Guardian Ad Litem Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Appointment and Guardian Ad Litem Documents; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Notices of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Notices of Appearance; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavits of Non-Military Service and Department of Defense Search Results

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavits of Non-Military Service and Department of Defense Search Results; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E DEATH CERTIFICATE

EXHIBIT(S) - E DEATH CERTIFICATE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTERS

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTERS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #02); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Appointment and Guardian Ad Litem Documents; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Notices of Appearance; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavits of Non-Military Service and Department of Defense Search Results; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #02) Affidavit of Service by Mail pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(3); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WILLIAM CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #2"; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WENDY CHARGO - "JOHN DOE #1"; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E DEATH CERTIFICATE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTERS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less