This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 09/09/2020 at 16:03:54 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. LORRAINE M PARATORE et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LORRAINE M PARATORE. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Lamendola. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Lamendola

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

Lorraine M Paratore

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing for the Request for Judicial Intervention

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing for the Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Mailing for the Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Class Action LLC; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less