This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 03/01/2020 at 16:34:59 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC, v. JACOB M LOCKE et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JACOB M LOCKE. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert B Wiggins. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********72CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert B Wiggins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendant

Jacob M Locke A/K/A JACOB MICHAEL LOCKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OLSON, KAREN B.

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI & MANFRO LLP

KENNEY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD JACKIE TARNACKI AS JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD JACKIE TARNACKI AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT

EXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Kenney, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD JACKIE TARNACKI AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JACKIE TARNACKI AS JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Olson, K.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less