This case was last updated from Cortland County Courts on 03/22/2020 at 21:31:32 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC v. IAN ANDREAS et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2019 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IAN ANDREAS. This case was filed in Cortland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1513

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Cortland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

John Doe JOHN DOE NUMBER ONE THROUGH JOHN DOE NUMBER TEN

NEW YORK STATE AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION

Ian Andreas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOMOSINSKI, RICHARD F

Attorney at KNUCKLES, KOMOSINSKI, & MANFRO, LLP.

Defendant Attorney

WALLS, MICHELE M

Attorney at NYS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM - OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 IAN ANDREAS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 IAN ANDREAS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - IAN ANDREAS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - IAN ANDREAS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NEW YORK STATE AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NEW YORK STATE AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G CERT OF MERIT

EXHIBIT(S) - G CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F JUDGEMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - F JUDGEMENTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E JUDGMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - E JUDGMENTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER

EXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Walls, M.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOD - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - SHANNON HUBBARD AS JD#1; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - 3215 IAN ANDREAS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - IAN ANDREAS; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NEW YORK STATE AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION; Filed By: Komosinski, R. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G CERT OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F JUDGEMENTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E JUDGMENTS; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D DEMAND LETTER; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Komosinski, R.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less